THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:49:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARAM KARKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARKAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARAM KARKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARKAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019