THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 04:30:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Vascular Surgery
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 18193
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Vascular Surgery
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 18193
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHREYA JALALI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. JALALI is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. JALALI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. JALALI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. JALALI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. JALALI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. JALALI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHREYA JALALI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. JALALI is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. JALALI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. JALALI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. JALALI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. JALALI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. JALALI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Vascular Surgery
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Vascular Surgery
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Vascular Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Vascular Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019