THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:38:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London Ontario N6A 5C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196612019
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 18 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waterloo Regional Health Network Kitchener
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: Waterloo Regional Health Network
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London Ontario N6A 5C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196612019
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 18 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waterloo Regional Health Network Kitchener
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: Waterloo Regional Health Network
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHENG WEI LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHENG WEI LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019