THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:57:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: Rath-Wilson, Kate Elizabeth (Used Until: 14 May 2023)
Medical School: Queen's University, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205-1355 Bank St
Ottawa ON K1H 8K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-721-2907
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 76 Stuart Street
Lakeside Clinic
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Phone: 613-548-2423
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 955 Green Valley Crescent
Ottawa Fertility Centre
100
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3V4
Phone: (613) 686-3378
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 420 Cooper Street
Various
Ottawa Ontario K2P 0H2
Phone: 613-233-4697
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

General Information

Former Name: Rath-Wilson, Kate Elizabeth (Used Until: 14 May 2023)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205-1355 Bank St
Ottawa ON K1H 8K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-721-2907
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 76 Stuart Street
Lakeside Clinic
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Phone: 613-548-2423
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 955 Green Valley Crescent
Ottawa Fertility Centre
100
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3V4
Phone: (613) 686-3378
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 420 Cooper Street
Various
Ottawa Ontario K2P 0H2
Phone: 613-233-4697
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATE ELIZABETH MCROW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCROW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATE ELIZABETH MCROW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCROW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019