THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:08:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2024 to 05 May 2025
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
07 May 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2023 to 06 May 2024
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
09 May 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2022 to 08 May 2023
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
10 May 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Aug 2021 to 09 May 2022
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2021 to 31 Jul 2021
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 05 May 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 07 May 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 06 May 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 09 May 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 08 May 2023
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 10 May 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Aug 2021 to 09 May 2022
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 31 Jul 2021
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 May 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 May 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019