THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:41:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Palliative Medicine
06 Apr 2020 to 03 May 2020
University of Toronto
EL - Psychiatry
09 Mar 2020 to 05 Apr 2020
University of Toronto
EL - Emergency Medicine
16 Dec 2019 to 08 Mar 2020
University of Toronto
EL - Family Medicine
18 Nov 2019 to 15 Dec 2019
University of Toronto
EL - Emergency Medicine
21 Oct 2019 to 17 Nov 2019
University of Toronto
EL - Geriatric Medicine
23 Sep 2019 to 20 Oct 2019
McMaster University
EL - Geriatric Medicine
26 Aug 2019 to 22 Sep 2019
University of Toronto
EL - Emergency Medicine
29 Jul 2019 to 25 Aug 2019
University of Toronto
EL - Geriatric Medicine
01 Jul 2019 to 28 Jul 2019
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: EL - Palliative Medicine
DATE: 06 Apr 2020 to 03 May 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Psychiatry
DATE: 09 Mar 2020 to 05 Apr 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 16 Dec 2019 to 08 Mar 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Family Medicine
DATE: 18 Nov 2019 to 15 Dec 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 21 Oct 2019 to 17 Nov 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 23 Sep 2019 to 20 Oct 2019
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: EL - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 26 Aug 2019 to 22 Sep 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 29 Jul 2019 to 25 Aug 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 28 Jul 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 May 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 May 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019