THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 05:20:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 270 Marier Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1L 5P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 343-633-5271
Fax: 613-749-2902

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 20 Nov 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 270 Marier Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1L 5P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 343-633-5271
Fax: 613-749-2902

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 20 Nov 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH MARCEL JUSTIN DESROCHERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESROCHERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH MARCEL JUSTIN DESROCHERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESROCHERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019