THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:15:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
Department Of Pediatrics
1200 Main St W
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 17 Dec 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 23 Dec 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 23 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
Department Of Pediatrics
1200 Main St W
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 17 Dec 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 23 Dec 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 23 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOLLY JANE DUSHNICKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUSHNICKY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOLLY JANE DUSHNICKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUSHNICKY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019