THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:49:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
RFE Building, Ground Floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3946
Fax: (416)-340-4300
Address: 399 Bathurst Street
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Fell Pavilion, 1st Fl
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-603-5757
Fax: 416-603-5288
Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital
Sports Medicine, MI-STREAM Clinic,
Altum Health, KDT, 4th Floor,
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5092
Fax: (416) 603-5406

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
RFE Building, Ground Floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3946
Fax: (416)-340-4300
Address: 399 Bathurst Street
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Fell Pavilion, 1st Fl
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-603-5757
Fax: 416-603-5288
Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital
Sports Medicine, MI-STREAM Clinic,
Altum Health, KDT, 4th Floor,
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5092
Fax: (416) 603-5406

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARTHUR MICHAEL WELSHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELSHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARTHUR MICHAEL WELSHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELSHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019