THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 07:25:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1874 Queen St E
Magenta Health
Toronto ON M4L 1H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-479-8410
Fax: 647-689-7272
Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Toronto Ontario M4J 5C2
Phone: 4164618272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Feb 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 14 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1874 Queen St E
Magenta Health
Toronto ON M4L 1H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-479-8410
Fax: 647-689-7272
Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Toronto Ontario M4J 5C2
Phone: 4164618272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Feb 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 14 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAITLIN MAURA PATTRICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATTRICK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAITLIN MAURA PATTRICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATTRICK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019