THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 05:16:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2024 to 10 Jan 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
11 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2023 to 10 Jan 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 10 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 11 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 10 Jan 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Apr 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019