THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:47:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Prefer not to answer
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-848-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 23 Feb 2025
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 23 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Prefer not to answer
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-848-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 23 Feb 2025
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 23 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CASEY KAI YEE MACKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKENZIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CASEY KAI YEE MACKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKENZIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Feb 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019