THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:07:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1276 South Park St
Suite 407 Bethune Building
Division of General Internal Medicine, Dalhousie University & Nova Scotia Health
Halifax NS B3H 2Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 25 Dec 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 25 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1276 South Park St
Suite 407 Bethune Building
Division of General Internal Medicine, Dalhousie University & Nova Scotia Health
Halifax NS B3H 2Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 25 Dec 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 25 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW KIPROP EHRLICH GREENACRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENACRE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW KIPROP EHRLICH GREENACRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENACRE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Sep 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Aug 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019