THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:41:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: Munir, Sara Asif (Used Until: 06 Aug 2019)
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-6870 Goreway Dr
Mississauga ON L4V 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6479956364
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Feb 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sara Hashmi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hashmi (CPSO#: 118430 )
Business Address: 6870 Goreway Drive
Mississauga Ontario L4V 1P1
905- 677-4200

General Information

Former Name: Munir, Sara Asif (Used Until: 06 Aug 2019)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-6870 Goreway Dr
Mississauga ON L4V 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6479956364
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Feb 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sara Hashmi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hashmi (CPSO#: 118430 )
Business Address: 6870 Goreway Drive
Mississauga Ontario L4V 1P1
905- 677-4200

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARA HASHMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASHMI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARA HASHMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASHMI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Feb 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2019