Medical School:
University of Calgary, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics |
01 Jul 2024 to 19 May 2025 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics |
29 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics |
01 Jul 2023 to 28 Aug 2023 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics |
30 Aug 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics |
01 Jul 2022 to 29 Aug 2022 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics |
03 Mar 2022 to 30 Jun 2022 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics |
01 Jul 2021 to 02 Mar 2022 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics |
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics |
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020 |
University of Ottawa |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 19 May 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
DATE:
29 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 28 Aug 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
DATE:
30 Aug 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 29 Aug 2022
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
DATE:
03 Mar 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
DATE:
01 Jul 2021 to 02 Mar 2022
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
DATE:
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
DATE:
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa