THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:48:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019