THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:14:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine St Vincen, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Department of Neurology
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3197
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine St Vincen, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Department of Neurology
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3197
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN NEEL JAIN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. JAIN is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. JAIN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. JAIN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. JAIN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. JAIN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. JAIN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN NEEL JAIN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. JAIN is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. JAIN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. JAIN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. JAIN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. JAIN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. JAIN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine St Vincen, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
24 Sep 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
AVP - Neurology
01 Jul 2019 to 23 Sep 2019
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
DATE: 24 Sep 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: AVP - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 23 Sep 2019
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019