THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:56:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 139 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 3, 2nd Floor
North York Dermatology Clinic
Toronto Ontario M2N 3A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 222-7546
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 27 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 139 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 3, 2nd Floor
North York Dermatology Clinic
Toronto Ontario M2N 3A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 222-7546
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 27 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANNY MAZIN JOSEPH MANSOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANSOUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANNY MAZIN JOSEPH MANSOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANSOUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Oct 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 May 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 May 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2019