THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:02:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: Roberts-MacDonald, Miesha Marielle (Used Until: 19 Jul 2020)
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1365 Richmond Rd
Pinecrest Queensway Community Health Centre
Ottawa ON K2B 6R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Oct 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Roberts-MacDonald, Miesha Marielle (Used Until: 19 Jul 2020)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1365 Richmond Rd
Pinecrest Queensway Community Health Centre
Ottawa ON K2B 6R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Oct 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIESHA MARIELLE ROBERTS-RIVERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTS-RIVERA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIESHA MARIELLE ROBERTS-RIVERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTS-RIVERA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Oct 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019