THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:52:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Avenue
Hospital for Sick Children
Department Of Paediatric Neurology
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Avenue
Hospital for Sick Children
Department Of Paediatric Neurology
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN ELIZABETH STRASSER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. STRASSER is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. STRASSER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. STRASSER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. STRASSER shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. STRASSER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. STRASSER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN ELIZABETH STRASSER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. STRASSER is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. STRASSER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. STRASSER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. STRASSER shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. STRASSER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. STRASSER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Neurology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Neurology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatric Neurology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatric Neurology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatric Neurology
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatric Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatric Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatric Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019