THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 07:21:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW ALEXANDER BENNETT SHAW shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SHAW is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. SHAW shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SHAW is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SHAW shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SHAW is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SHAW no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 21 August, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW ALEXANDER BENNETT SHAW shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SHAW is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. SHAW shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SHAW is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SHAW shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SHAW is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SHAW no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 21 August, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
29 Jul 2025 to 21 Aug 2025
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2025 to 28 Jul 2025
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
29 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
30 Jul 2024 to 28 Jan 2025
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2024 to 29 Jul 2024
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
19 Dec 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2023 to 18 Dec 2023
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
20 Dec 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2022 to 19 Dec 2022
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
14 Jun 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
06 Dec 2021 to 13 Jun 2022
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2021 to 05 Dec 2021
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 29 Jul 2025 to 21 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 28 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 29 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 30 Jul 2024 to 28 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 29 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 19 Dec 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 18 Dec 2023
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 20 Dec 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 19 Dec 2022
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 14 Jun 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 06 Dec 2021 to 13 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 05 Dec 2021
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 21 Aug 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 21 Aug 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019