THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:49:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1125 Colonel By Dr
Carleton University Sports Medicine Clinic
Carleton Ice House
Ottawa ON K1S 5B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 520-3510
Fax: (613) 520-3974
Address: 274 Ida St N
1066
Arnprior ON K7S 0J2
Phone: 6136221800
Fax: 6136221801
Address: PO Box 450
Mary Berglund Community Health Centre
Ignace ON P0T 1T0
Phone: 807-934-2251
Fax: 807-934-6552

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1125 Colonel By Dr
Carleton University Sports Medicine Clinic
Carleton Ice House
Ottawa ON K1S 5B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 520-3510
Fax: (613) 520-3974
Address: 274 Ida St N
1066
Arnprior ON K7S 0J2
Phone: 6136221800
Fax: 6136221801
Address: PO Box 450
Mary Berglund Community Health Centre
Ignace ON P0T 1T0
Phone: 807-934-2251
Fax: 807-934-6552

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAYLA GALLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAYLA GALLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019