THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:42:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 29 Noxon St
Ingersoll ON N5C 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-485-1700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Phone: 519-621-2330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 135 Fennell Ave W
Mohawk College Health and Wellness
Hamilton ON L9C 0E5
Phone: 905-575-2211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Jean Duncan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Nov 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 29 Noxon St
Ingersoll ON N5C 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-485-1700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Phone: 519-621-2330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 135 Fennell Ave W
Mohawk College Health and Wellness
Hamilton ON L9C 0E5
Phone: 905-575-2211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Jean Duncan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Nov 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA JEAN DUNCAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNCAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA JEAN DUNCAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNCAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019