THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:59:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 540
Bronte Medical FHO
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 827 9865
Fax: (905) 827 3583
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-338-4437
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1927 Ironoak Way
Seashell Medical Centre Oakville
Oakville Ontario L6H 0N1
Phone: (905) 636-9387
Fax: (905)636-9388

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 05 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 28 Aug 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 28 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 540
Bronte Medical FHO
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 827 9865
Fax: (905) 827 3583
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-338-4437
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1927 Ironoak Way
Seashell Medical Centre Oakville
Oakville Ontario L6H 0N1
Phone: (905) 636-9387
Fax: (905)636-9388

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 05 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 28 Aug 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 28 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IHAB KANDIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANDIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IHAB KANDIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANDIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 May 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019