THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:28:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
Blood Disorders Program
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-4205
Fax: 416-340-3590​

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 20 Nov 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
Blood Disorders Program
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-4205
Fax: 416-340-3590​

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 20 Nov 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAYLOR ELIZABETH DEAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAYLOR ELIZABETH DEAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019