THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:11:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lublin, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1671 Howard Ave
Grow N Blossom Paediatric Clinic
Windsor Ontario N8X 3T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 256 4040
Fax: 519 258 2020
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 24 Jun 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zil-E-Huma Sheikh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Aug 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lublin, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1671 Howard Ave
Grow N Blossom Paediatric Clinic
Windsor Ontario N8X 3T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 256 4040
Fax: 519 258 2020
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 24 Jun 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zil-E-Huma Sheikh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Aug 2021

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
31 Aug 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 31 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Zil-e-huma Sheikh may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Zil-e-huma Sheikh may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lublin, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2019