THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:43:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 165 Ferris Lane
Barrie Ontario L4M 2Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-866-377-0286
Extension: 7303
Fax: 705-915-3235
Address: 13175 Yonge Street
Children's Treatment Network
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 0G6
Phone: 1-866-377-0286
Fax: 705-792-2775

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Developmental Pediatrics
Effective: 04 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Developmental Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 165 Ferris Lane
Barrie Ontario L4M 2Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-866-377-0286
Extension: 7303
Fax: 705-915-3235
Address: 13175 Yonge Street
Children's Treatment Network
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 0G6
Phone: 1-866-377-0286
Fax: 705-792-2775

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Developmental Pediatrics
Effective: 04 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Developmental Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARI MICHAEL SHORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHORE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARI MICHAEL SHORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHORE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Feb 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019