THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:20:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department Of Medicine
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department Of Medicine
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
08 Sep 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 08 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1 of 2)
Dr. Akioyamen has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions.

(2 of 2)
(1) Dr. LEO EROMONSELE AKIOYAMEN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AKIOYAMEN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. AKIOYAMEN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AKIOYAMEN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AKIOYAMEN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AKIOYAMEN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AKIOYAMEN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1 of 2)
Dr. Akioyamen has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions.

(2 of 2)
(1) Dr. LEO EROMONSELE AKIOYAMEN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AKIOYAMEN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. AKIOYAMEN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AKIOYAMEN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AKIOYAMEN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AKIOYAMEN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AKIOYAMEN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (6)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 23 Apr 2025
Summary:

Release Conditions

On April 23, 2025, the following Release Conditions were imposed on Leo Akioyamen:

  1. Akioyamen reside with his sureties at specified address.
  2. Akioyamen must remain in the residence at all times except: for medical emergencies   involving him or a member of his immediate family; for court appearances; in the direct and continuous presence of one of his sureties.
  3. Akioyamen must not contact or communicate in any way either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with named persons.
  4. Akioyamen must not be within 100 metres of any place he knows named persons to live, work, go to school, frequent or any place he knows them to be except for required court appearances.
  5. Akioyamen must not attend specified address.
  6. Akioyamen must not attend within 200 metres of specified address.
  7. Akioyamen must not contact or communicate with specified person, in any way either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means.
  8. Akioyamen must not possess any weapon(s) as defined by the Criminal Code of Canada.
  9. Akioyamen must not apply for an authorization, licence or registration certificate of any weapon as defined by the Criminal Code of Canada.
  10. Akioyamen will remain in custody until a GPS monitoring device is available to place on his person and is applied.
  11. Akioyamen will be suject to GPS monitoring by Recovery Science Corporation and agree to abide by all of its rules and protocols by providing his signature on the GPS Rules and Protocols which will be attached to this release order as Schedule “A”.  These rules and protocols form part of this Release Order.


Source: Other
Effective Date: 17 Mar 2025
Summary:

Charges 

Leo Akioyamen was charged with the following offences: 

1.  Unlawfully entering a dwelling-house with intent to commit an indictable offence therein, on or about March 15, 2025, contrary to section 349(1) of the Criminal Code of Canada. 

2.  Possession of a Schedule I Controlled Substance (methamphetamine), on or about March 15, 2025, contrary to section 4(1) of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act (Canada). 

3.  Breaking and entering a dwelling-house and committing therein the indictable offence of theft, on or about March 16, 2025, contrary to section 348(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada. 

Date of Charge:  March 17, 2025 and March 20, 2025   

Place of Charge:  Toronto, Ontario  

Toronto Police Services 



Source: Other
Effective Date: 15 Mar 2025
Summary:

Release Conditions 

On March 15, 2025, the following Release Conditions were imposed on Leo Akioyamen: 

1.  Akioyamen must not go to a specified address. 

2.  Akioyamen must not be in possession of any keys that do not belong to him. 

3.  Akioyamen must not be in possession of prescription drugs not in his name. 



Source: Other
Effective Date: 23 Jan 2025
Summary:
Findings of Guilt

Leo Akioyamen was found guilty of the following offence:
  1. Assault, contrary to section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date: January 23, 2025
SENTENCE: Pending


Source: Other
Effective Date: 27 Feb 2024
Summary:
On February 27, 2024, the following Bail Conditions were imposed on Leo Akioyamen:

1.  Akioyamen must not communicate, directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with named persons.
2.  Akioyamen must not go within 200 meters of any place named persons are known to live, work ,go to school, frequent or any place they are known to be except for required court appearances.
3.  Akioyamen must not attend at a specified address.
4.  Akioyamen must no possess any weapon(s) as defined by the Criminal Code.
5.  Akioyamen must not apply for an authorization, licence or registration certification for any weapon as defined by the Criminal Code.
6.  Akioyamen must report to the Toronto Bail Program on the business day following release in person by 10am and thereafter as directed.  Be under the direction and supervision of the program and be amendable to its rules and regulations.
7.  Akioyamen must reside at an address approved by the Bail Program and not move from that address without obtaining approval for a new address from the Toronto Bail Program.
8.  Akioyamen must attend and actively participate in any counselling/programming and or rehabilitative program(s) as directed by his Bail Supervisor.
9.  Akioyamen must sign any release forms to allow the Bail program to monitor his attendance and progress.


Source: Other
Effective Date: 25 Feb 2024
Summary:

Charges 

 

Leo Akioyamen was charged with the following offences: 

 

1. Theft, on or about February 25, 2024, contrary to section 334(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada. 

2. Utter Threat to Cause Bodily Harm, on or about February 25, 2024, contrary to section 264.1(1)(a). 

3. Mischief, on or about February 25, 2024, contrary to section 430(1)(c) of the Criminal Code of Canada. 

4. Assault on a Peace Officer, on or about February 25, 2024, contrary to section 270(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada. 

5. 2 x Assault Resisting Arrest, on or about February 25, 2024, contrary to section 270(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada. 

 

Date of Charge:  February 25, 2024    

Place of Charge:  Toronto, Ontario  

Toronto Police Services 


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (6)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 23 Apr 2025
Summary:

Release Conditions

On April 23, 2025, the following Release Conditions were imposed on Leo Akioyamen:

  1. Akioyamen reside with his sureties at specified address.
  2. Akioyamen must remain in the residence at all times except: for medical emergencies   involving him or a member of his immediate family; for court appearances; in the direct and continuous presence of one of his sureties.
  3. Akioyamen must not contact or communicate in any way either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with named persons.
  4. Akioyamen must not be within 100 metres of any place he knows named persons to live, work, go to school, frequent or any place he knows them to be except for required court appearances.
  5. Akioyamen must not attend specified address.
  6. Akioyamen must not attend within 200 metres of specified address.
  7. Akioyamen must not contact or communicate with specified person, in any way either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means.
  8. Akioyamen must not possess any weapon(s) as defined by the Criminal Code of Canada.
  9. Akioyamen must not apply for an authorization, licence or registration certificate of any weapon as defined by the Criminal Code of Canada.
  10. Akioyamen will remain in custody until a GPS monitoring device is available to place on his person and is applied.
  11. Akioyamen will be suject to GPS monitoring by Recovery Science Corporation and agree to abide by all of its rules and protocols by providing his signature on the GPS Rules and Protocols which will be attached to this release order as Schedule “A”.  These rules and protocols form part of this Release Order.


Source: Other
Effective Date: 17 Mar 2025
Summary:

Charges 

Leo Akioyamen was charged with the following offences: 

1.  Unlawfully entering a dwelling-house with intent to commit an indictable offence therein, on or about March 15, 2025, contrary to section 349(1) of the Criminal Code of Canada. 

2.  Possession of a Schedule I Controlled Substance (methamphetamine), on or about March 15, 2025, contrary to section 4(1) of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act (Canada). 

3.  Breaking and entering a dwelling-house and committing therein the indictable offence of theft, on or about March 16, 2025, contrary to section 348(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada. 

Date of Charge:  March 17, 2025 and March 20, 2025   

Place of Charge:  Toronto, Ontario  

Toronto Police Services 



Source: Other
Effective Date: 15 Mar 2025
Summary:

Release Conditions 

On March 15, 2025, the following Release Conditions were imposed on Leo Akioyamen: 

1.  Akioyamen must not go to a specified address. 

2.  Akioyamen must not be in possession of any keys that do not belong to him. 

3.  Akioyamen must not be in possession of prescription drugs not in his name. 



Source: Other
Effective Date: 23 Jan 2025
Summary:
Findings of Guilt

Leo Akioyamen was found guilty of the following offence:
  1. Assault, contrary to section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date: January 23, 2025
SENTENCE: Pending


Source: Other
Effective Date: 27 Feb 2024
Summary:
On February 27, 2024, the following Bail Conditions were imposed on Leo Akioyamen:

1.  Akioyamen must not communicate, directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with named persons.
2.  Akioyamen must not go within 200 meters of any place named persons are known to live, work ,go to school, frequent or any place they are known to be except for required court appearances.
3.  Akioyamen must not attend at a specified address.
4.  Akioyamen must no possess any weapon(s) as defined by the Criminal Code.
5.  Akioyamen must not apply for an authorization, licence or registration certification for any weapon as defined by the Criminal Code.
6.  Akioyamen must report to the Toronto Bail Program on the business day following release in person by 10am and thereafter as directed.  Be under the direction and supervision of the program and be amendable to its rules and regulations.
7.  Akioyamen must reside at an address approved by the Bail Program and not move from that address without obtaining approval for a new address from the Toronto Bail Program.
8.  Akioyamen must attend and actively participate in any counselling/programming and or rehabilitative program(s) as directed by his Bail Supervisor.
9.  Akioyamen must sign any release forms to allow the Bail program to monitor his attendance and progress.


Source: Other
Effective Date: 25 Feb 2024
Summary:

Charges 

 

Leo Akioyamen was charged with the following offences: 

 

1. Theft, on or about February 25, 2024, contrary to section 334(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada. 

2. Utter Threat to Cause Bodily Harm, on or about February 25, 2024, contrary to section 264.1(1)(a). 

3. Mischief, on or about February 25, 2024, contrary to section 430(1)(c) of the Criminal Code of Canada. 

4. Assault on a Peace Officer, on or about February 25, 2024, contrary to section 270(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada. 

5. 2 x Assault Resisting Arrest, on or about February 25, 2024, contrary to section 270(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada. 

 

Date of Charge:  February 25, 2024    

Place of Charge:  Toronto, Ontario  

Toronto Police Services 


Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
06 Jun 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 05 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
09 Dec 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2020 to 08 Dec 2020
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 06 Jun 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 05 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 09 Dec 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 08 Dec 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019