THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:32:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 333 Wilson Avenue
Suite 302
Toronto Ontario M3H 1T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4378262211
Fax: 4164793752

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 333 Wilson Avenue
Suite 302
Toronto Ontario M3H 1T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4378262211
Fax: 4164793752

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAYER GRUNFELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRUNFELD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAYER GRUNFELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRUNFELD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2024
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 08 Aug 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019