THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:22:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Marathon Family Health Team
22 Peninsula Rd
Marathon ON P0T 2E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 2490
Atikokan General Hospital
120 Dorothy St
Atikokan ON P0T 1C0
Phone: 807-597*4215
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 1450
Atikokan Medical Clinic
123 Marks St.
Atikokan ON P0T 1C0
Phone: 807-597-2721
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 37911 Mackenzie Hwy
Hay River Reginal Health Centre
Hay River NT X0E 0R6
Phone: (867) 874-8000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 1000
Qikiqtani General Hospital
Iqaluit NU X0A 0H0
Phone: (867) 975-8600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North of Superior Health Care Group
Wilson Memorial General Hospital
26 Peninsula Rd
Marathon ON P0T 2E0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 125 Hogan Road
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
Nipigon Ontario P0T 2J0
Phone: 807-887-3026
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 370
The McCausland Hospital
20B Cartier Rd.
Terrace Bay ON P0T 2W0
Phone: 807-825-3273
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 819
North Shore Family Health Team
20B Cartier Rd.
Terrace Bay ON P0T 2W0
Phone: 807-825-3235
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 548 Byrne Rd
Stanton Territorial Hospital
Yellowknife NT X1A 0H1
Phone: (867) 669-4111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: McCausland Hospital
LOCATION: Terrace Bay

HOSPITAL: Wilson Memorial General Hospital
LOCATION: Marathon

HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Marathon Family Health Team
22 Peninsula Rd
Marathon ON P0T 2E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 2490
Atikokan General Hospital
120 Dorothy St
Atikokan ON P0T 1C0
Phone: 807-597*4215
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 1450
Atikokan Medical Clinic
123 Marks St.
Atikokan ON P0T 1C0
Phone: 807-597-2721
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 37911 Mackenzie Hwy
Hay River Reginal Health Centre
Hay River NT X0E 0R6
Phone: (867) 874-8000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 1000
Qikiqtani General Hospital
Iqaluit NU X0A 0H0
Phone: (867) 975-8600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North of Superior Health Care Group
Wilson Memorial General Hospital
26 Peninsula Rd
Marathon ON P0T 2E0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 125 Hogan Road
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
Nipigon Ontario P0T 2J0
Phone: 807-887-3026
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 370
The McCausland Hospital
20B Cartier Rd.
Terrace Bay ON P0T 2W0
Phone: 807-825-3273
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 819
North Shore Family Health Team
20B Cartier Rd.
Terrace Bay ON P0T 2W0
Phone: 807-825-3235
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 548 Byrne Rd
Stanton Territorial Hospital
Yellowknife NT X1A 0H1
Phone: (867) 669-4111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: McCausland Hospital
LOCATION: Terrace Bay

HOSPITAL: Wilson Memorial General Hospital
LOCATION: Marathon

HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY DRAKE GREIVE-PRICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREIVE-PRICE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY DRAKE GREIVE-PRICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREIVE-PRICE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019