THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:48:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 36B Prince Arthur Ave
Toronto ON M5R 1A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)-961-0113
Fax: (416) 961-9856
Address: 61 Queen St E
Toronto ON M5C 2T2
Phone: 416-867-7428
Fax: 416-867-7498
Address: 465 Dundas Street East
Regent Park Community Health Centre
Toronto Ontario M5A 2B2
Phone: 416-364-2261
Fax: 416-364-0822
Address: 200-489 College St
Toronto ON M6G 1A5
Phone: (416) 323-9986
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 36B Prince Arthur Ave
Toronto ON M5R 1A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)-961-0113
Fax: (416) 961-9856
Address: 61 Queen St E
Toronto ON M5C 2T2
Phone: 416-867-7428
Fax: 416-867-7498
Address: 465 Dundas Street East
Regent Park Community Health Centre
Toronto Ontario M5A 2B2
Phone: 416-364-2261
Fax: 416-364-0822
Address: 200-489 College St
Toronto ON M6G 1A5
Phone: (416) 323-9986
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RABEA RAZI PARPIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARPIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RABEA RAZI PARPIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARPIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019