THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:26:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
Department of Anesthesiology
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
Department of Anesthesiology
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTEN SHIRLEY ANN SHEFFIELD shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SHEFFIELD is enrolled at Northern Ontario School of Medicine;
(2) Dr. SHEFFIELD shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SHEFFIELD is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SHEFFIELD shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SHEFFIELD is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SHEFFIELD no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 1 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTEN SHIRLEY ANN SHEFFIELD shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SHEFFIELD is enrolled at Northern Ontario School of Medicine;
(2) Dr. SHEFFIELD shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SHEFFIELD is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SHEFFIELD shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SHEFFIELD is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SHEFFIELD no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 1 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
02 Jun 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
01 Dec 2024 to 01 Jun 2025
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2024 to 01 Dec 2024
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
11 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2023 to 10 Mar 2024
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
13 Mar 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2022 to 12 Mar 2023
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
14 Mar 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2021 to 13 Mar 2022
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 02 Jun 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Dec 2024 to 01 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 01 Dec 2024
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 11 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 10 Mar 2024
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 13 Mar 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 12 Mar 2023
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 14 Mar 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 13 Mar 2022
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 01 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 01 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019