THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:52:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais (UFMG) Faculdade de Medicina, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Campus Services Building 1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster Children's Hospital
Room 3A
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)521-2100
Extension: 75264
Fax: (905)521-7914
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Cardiology
Effective: 01 May 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais (UFMG) Faculdade de Medicina, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Campus Services Building 1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster Children's Hospital
Room 3A
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)521-2100
Extension: 75264
Fax: (905)521-7914
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Cardiology
Effective: 01 May 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
04 Apr 2025
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 04 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. OCTAVIO DE SOUZA E SILVA NETTO may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Pediatric Cardiology, McMaster University, in which Dr. DE SOUZA E SILVA NETTO holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. DE SOUZA E SILVA NETTO no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. DE SOUZA E SILVA NETTO’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. DE SOUZA E SILVA NETTO’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 May, 2022, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. DE SOUZA E SILVA NETTO's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. OCTAVIO DE SOUZA E SILVA NETTO may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Pediatric Cardiology, McMaster University, in which Dr. DE SOUZA E SILVA NETTO holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. DE SOUZA E SILVA NETTO no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. DE SOUZA E SILVA NETTO’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. DE SOUZA E SILVA NETTO’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 May, 2022, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. DE SOUZA E SILVA NETTO's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais (UFMG) Faculdade de Medicina, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 May 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 May 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019