THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:12:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Western University, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KURDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3359 Mississauga Road
University of Toronto - Mississauga
Health and Counselling Centre
Room 1152, Davis Building
Mississauga Ontario L5L 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-828-5255
Fax: 905-828-3852
Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KURDI
Medical School: Western University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3359 Mississauga Road
University of Toronto - Mississauga
Health and Counselling Centre
Room 1152, Davis Building
Mississauga Ontario L5L 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-828-5255
Fax: 905-828-3852
Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARA SALAR ABDUL HAKIM AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARA SALAR ABDUL HAKIM AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Western University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Sep 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019