THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:36:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare
Department of Psychiatry
100 West 5th St
Toronto Ontario L8N 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-522-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 28 Dec 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare
Department of Psychiatry
100 West 5th St
Toronto Ontario L8N 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-522-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 28 Dec 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTIN ISABEL DELCELLIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELCELLIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTIN ISABEL DELCELLIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELCELLIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019