THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:21:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Area Hospital
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Area Hospital
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AFSHEEN MEHAR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MEHAR is enrolled at Northern Ontario School of Medicine;
(2) Dr. MEHAR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MEHAR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MEHAR shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MEHAR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MEHAR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 19 October, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AFSHEEN MEHAR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MEHAR is enrolled at Northern Ontario School of Medicine;
(2) Dr. MEHAR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MEHAR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MEHAR shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MEHAR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MEHAR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 19 October, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 2000
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
20 Oct 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 19 Oct 2025
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
21 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 20 Oct 2024
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
16 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
AVP - Family Medicine
23 Oct 2023 to 15 Jan 2024
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
28 Aug 2023 to 28 Aug 2025
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
AVP - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2019 to 31 Oct 2019
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
DATE: 20 Oct 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 19 Oct 2025
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 21 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 20 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 16 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: AVP - Family Medicine
DATE: 23 Oct 2023 to 15 Jan 2024
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 28 Aug 2023 to 28 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: AVP - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Oct 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 19 Oct 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 19 Oct 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019