THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:13:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C H E O
Department of Pediatrics
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C H E O
Department of Pediatrics
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Jan 2025
30 Jun 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 12 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. JULIA ALEXANDRA HUNTER-SCHOUELA shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA is enrolled at the University of Ottawa.

(2) In Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA may practise pediatrics and to the extent of their employment at the Children’s Hospital of Eastern Ontario while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisor identified in paragraph (4) notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. JULIA ALEXANDRA HUNTER-SCHOUELA shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA is enrolled at the University of Ottawa.

(2) In Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA may practise pediatrics and to the extent of their employment at the Children’s Hospital of Eastern Ontario while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisor identified in paragraph (4) notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. HUNTER-SCHOUELA applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
08 Apr 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 Jul 2025 to 07 Apr 2026
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
08 Apr 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2024 to 07 Apr 2025
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
23 Sep 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Ottawa
AVP - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2019 to 22 Sep 2019
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 08 Apr 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 07 Apr 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 08 Apr 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 07 Apr 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
DATE: 23 Sep 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: AVP - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 22 Sep 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2025
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2025
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019