THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:38:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Regional
Health Centre
Department of Family Medicine
201 Georgian Dr
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200-370 Bayview Dr
Barrie ON L4N 7L3
Phone: 705-315-2801
Fax: 705-722-7933

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Regional
Health Centre
Department of Family Medicine
201 Georgian Dr
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200-370 Bayview Dr
Barrie ON L4N 7L3
Phone: 705-315-2801
Fax: 705-722-7933

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL DAVID PASSAFIUME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASSAFIUME is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL DAVID PASSAFIUME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASSAFIUME is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019