THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:47:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Effective: 04 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Effective: 04 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
10 Feb 2020 to 17 Feb 2020
McMaster University
EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
02 Sep 2019 to 13 Sep 2019
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
02 Jul 2019 to 28 Jul 2019
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
DATE: 10 Feb 2020 to 17 Feb 2020
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
DATE: 02 Sep 2019 to 13 Sep 2019
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
DATE: 02 Jul 2019 to 28 Jul 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Feb 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Sep 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jul 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2019