THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:49:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Sick Kids
Community Mental Health
440 Jarvis St.
Tornto, Onatrio
M4Y-2H3
Date Received: 28 Apr 2020

Instructions/Address: 1645 Sheppard Ave. West
Noth York, Onatrio
M3M 2X4
Date Received: 28 Apr 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Sick Kids
Community Mental Health
440 Jarvis St.
Tornto, Onatrio
M4Y-2H3
Date Received: 28 Apr 2020

Instructions/Address: 1645 Sheppard Ave. West
Noth York, Onatrio
M3M 2X4
Date Received: 28 Apr 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 Aug 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2019