THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:33:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1145 King St W
Hamilton ON L8S 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 17057738061
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute - Lyndhurst Centre
Spinal Cord Injury
Toronto Ontario M4G 3V9
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1145 King St W
Hamilton ON L8S 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 17057738061
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute - Lyndhurst Centre
Spinal Cord Injury
Toronto Ontario M4G 3V9
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAXWELL CHARLES GOODWIN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. GOODWIN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. GOODWIN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GOODWIN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. GOODWIN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. GOODWIN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. GOODWIN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAXWELL CHARLES GOODWIN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. GOODWIN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. GOODWIN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GOODWIN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. GOODWIN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. GOODWIN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. GOODWIN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
08 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2023 to 07 Jul 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
08 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2022 to 07 Jul 2022
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
08 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2021 to 07 Jul 2021
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 08 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 07 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 08 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 07 Jul 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 08 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 07 Jul 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Jul 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019