THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:25:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: Kim, Kristina (Used Until: 25 Sep 2024)
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anesthesia
McMaster University
Health Sciences Centre 2V9
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 521 2100
Fax: 905 523 1224
Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Anesthesia
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
Phone: 905-522-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 16 Jan 2025
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 16 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: Kim, Kristina (Used Until: 25 Sep 2024)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anesthesia
McMaster University
Health Sciences Centre 2V9
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 521 2100
Fax: 905 523 1224
Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Anesthesia
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
Phone: 905-522-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 16 Jan 2025
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 16 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTINA KIM-UM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM-UM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTINA KIM-UM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM-UM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019