THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:12:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences Centre
Department Of Emergency Medicine
339 Windermere Rd
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences Centre
Department Of Emergency Medicine
339 Windermere Rd
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ANTHONY MACISAAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACISAAC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ANTHONY MACISAAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACISAAC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019