THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 14:50:50 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Colombia, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
Krembil Neuroscience Centre
West Wing – 5th Floor
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Calle 44 59
75
Hospital Universitario Nacional de Colombia
Bogotá Colombia 111321
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: National University of Colombia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
Krembil Neuroscience Centre
West Wing – 5th Floor
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Calle 44 59
75
Hospital Universitario Nacional de Colombia
Bogotá Colombia 111321
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUAN CAMILO VARGAS GONZALEZ may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. VARGAS GONZALEZ is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. VARGAS GONZALEZ shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. VARGAS GONZALEZ is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. VARGAS GONZALEZ shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. VARGAS GONZALEZ ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. VARGAS GONZALEZ ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUAN CAMILO VARGAS GONZALEZ may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. VARGAS GONZALEZ is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. VARGAS GONZALEZ shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. VARGAS GONZALEZ is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. VARGAS GONZALEZ shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. VARGAS GONZALEZ ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. VARGAS GONZALEZ ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Colombia, 2005
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Neurology
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
22 Aug 2019 to 31 Jan 2020
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PEAP - CF - Neurology
17 Jun 2019 to 21 Aug 2019
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 23 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 22 Aug 2019 to 31 Jan 2020
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neurology
DATE: 17 Jun 2019 to 21 Aug 2019
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2019