THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:37:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196858500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196858500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDUL-RAHMAN IBRAHIM shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. IBRAHIM is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. IBRAHIM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. IBRAHIM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. IBRAHIM shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. IBRAHIM is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. IBRAHIM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDUL-RAHMAN IBRAHIM shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. IBRAHIM is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. IBRAHIM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. IBRAHIM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. IBRAHIM shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. IBRAHIM is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. IBRAHIM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Western University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
08 Mar 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2020 to 07 Mar 2021
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 08 Mar 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 07 Mar 2021
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019