THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:23:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Education Program
Department of Psychiatry
Room 4418
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8955
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Education Program
Department of Psychiatry
Room 4418
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8955
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOMINIKA SARA FUS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. FUS is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. FUS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. FUS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. FUS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. FUS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. FUS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOMINIKA SARA FUS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. FUS is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. FUS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. FUS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. FUS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. FUS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. FUS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
08 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2023 to 07 Aug 2023
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
30 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2022 to 29 Jul 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
23 Sep 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Ottawa
AVP - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2019 to 22 Sep 2019
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 08 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 07 Aug 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 30 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 29 Jul 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 23 Sep 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: AVP - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 22 Sep 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019