THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:30:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10240 Kingsway NW
Royal Alexandra Hospital (NICU)
Philip C. Etches NICU
DTC 5027
Edmonton AB T5H 3V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 18 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10240 Kingsway NW
Royal Alexandra Hospital (NICU)
Philip C. Etches NICU
DTC 5027
Edmonton AB T5H 3V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 18 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA KOWALCZYK shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KOWALCZYK is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. KOWALCZYK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KOWALCZYK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KOWALCZYK shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KOWALCZYK is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KOWALCZYK no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA KOWALCZYK shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KOWALCZYK is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. KOWALCZYK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KOWALCZYK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KOWALCZYK shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KOWALCZYK is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KOWALCZYK no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
EL - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
25 Sep 2023 to 22 Oct 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
24 Sep 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
AVP - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2019 to 23 Sep 2019
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 25 Sep 2023 to 22 Oct 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
DATE: 24 Sep 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: AVP - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 23 Sep 2019
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Oct 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019