Medical School:
University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine |
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
University of Toronto |
EL - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine |
30 Jul 2019 to 26 Aug 2019 |
University of Ottawa |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
EL - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
30 Jul 2019 to 26 Aug 2019
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa