THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:27:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4 Campbell Dr
Uxbridge Hospital
Uxbridge ON L9P 1R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 852-9771
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4 Campbell Dr
Uxbridge Hospital
Uxbridge ON L9P 1R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 852-9771
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIAN YUE WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIAN YUE WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2019