THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:40:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: c1-95 Times Avenue
Markham Ontario L3T 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-707-0666
Fax: 289-807-0597
Address: unit 103-50 McIntosh Drive
Markham Ontario L3R 9T3
Phone: (289) 378-5077
Fax: 289-807-0597
Address: 11-100 Steeles Ave W
Thornhill ON L4J 7Y1
Phone: 289-807-0596
Fax: 289-807-0597

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: c1-95 Times Avenue
Markham Ontario L3T 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-707-0666
Fax: 289-807-0597
Address: unit 103-50 McIntosh Drive
Markham Ontario L3R 9T3
Phone: (289) 378-5077
Fax: 289-807-0597
Address: 11-100 Steeles Ave W
Thornhill ON L4J 7Y1
Phone: 289-807-0596
Fax: 289-807-0597

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER YAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER YAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019